EP4231088 - BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUYANG, Shihong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHANG, Yiwen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21897179.4 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021CN133915 | Priority number, date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011384672 | [2023/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111679 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231088 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, H01L33/60 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H01L33/60 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133605 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
G02F1/133606 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/133609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL UND ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM | [2023/34] | English: | BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN | [2023/34] | French: | MODULE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2023 | Translation filed | 17.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007147081 (CHOI JONG-HYUN [KR]); | [A]US2009213571 (JIN MIN JI [KR], et al); | [XA]US2015261042 (SUGAYA HIROKI [JP]); | [IA]US2020006297 (YAMADA MOTOKAZU [JP]) |