EP4235371 - METHOD FOR SHARING INPUT DEVICE, ELECTRONIC DEVICES, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Bin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Binfei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LUO, Puliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21897190.1 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021CN134032 | Priority number, date | CN202011377539 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011377539 | CN202110131920 | 30.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110131920 | [2023/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111690 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235371 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0487, G06F3/04812, G06F13/10, G06F13/42 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/0354 (EP);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/03543 (US);
G06F3/04812 (EP);
G06F3/0487 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0381 (US);
G06F2203/0384 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | G06F3/0354, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0487 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG EINER EINGABEVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEM | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD FOR SHARING INPUT DEVICE, ELECTRONIC DEVICES, AND SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PARTAGE DE DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE, DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES ET SYSTÈME | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2023 | Translation filed | 22.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN103425408 (SHENZHEN FUTAIHONG PREC IND CO, et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Introducing scrcpy . ~rom1v/blog", (20180308), pages 1 - 30, URL: https://blog.rom1v.com/2018/03/introducing-scrcpy/, (20240209), XP093129555 [Y] 1-15 * page 1 - page 10 * |