EP4253494 - ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION, ARTICLE, HYDROLYZABLE ORGANOSILANE COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-1, Marunouchi 1 chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTA Akira Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21897416.0 | 16.08.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021JP29897 | Priority number, date | JP20200195627 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020195627 | [2023/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022113437 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253494 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J11/04, C09J11/06, C08K5/5415, C08L83/06, C09D183/06, C09J183/04, C09K3/10, C08K3/013, C08K3/04, C08K3/26, C08K3/36, C09D7/61 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP);
C08K5/5419 (KR);
C08G77/20 (US);
C07F7/188 (US);
C08G77/08 (US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/26 (US);
C08K3/26 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08K5/5415 (EP);
C08K5/5425 (EP);
C08K9/06 (US);
C08K9/08 (US);
C08L83/06 (KR);
C09D183/06 (KR,US);
C09D7/62 (US);
C09D7/63 (EP);
C09J11/04 (KR,US);
C09J11/06 (KR,US);
C09J183/04 (KR);
C09J183/06 (US);
C09K3/10 (KR);
C09K3/1018 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/265 (EP,KR);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C09J2203/326 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5425, C08L83/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | BEI RAUMTEMPERATUR HÄRTBARE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEGENSTAND, HYDROLYSIERBARE ORGANOSILANVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/40] | English: | ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION, ARTICLE, HYDROLYZABLE ORGANOSILANE COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/40] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE DURCISSABLE À TEMPÉRATURE AMBIANTE, ARTICLE, COMPOSÉ ORGANOSILANE HYDROLYSABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2023 | Translation filed | 09.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2015113377 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2019073670 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2020517771 ; | by applicant | JPS5139673B | JP2018515634 |