EP4253277 - PTP LIDDING MATERIAL AND PTP PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO Masafumi Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21897543.1 | 18.10.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021JP38437 | Priority number, date | JP20200194642 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020194642 | [2023/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022113565 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253277 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, B32B27/32, B65D75/36 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B65D75/327 (EP);
B65D75/367 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (US);
C08L23/12 (US);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2274/00 (US);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/581 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7376 (EP,US);
B32B2435/02 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (US);
B32B2439/80 (US);
B65D2565/387 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | PTP-ABDECKUNGSMATERIAL UND PTP-VERPACKUNG | [2023/40] | English: | PTP LIDDING MATERIAL AND PTP PACKAGE | [2023/40] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE FERMETURE POUR CONDITIONNEMENT AU TRAVERS DUQUEL APPLIQUER UNE FORCE DE PRESSION, ET CORPS D'EMBALLAGE DE CONDITIONNEMENT AU TRAVERS DUQUEL APPLIQUER UNE FORCE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2023 | Translation filed | 10.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012131933 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC); | [A]JP2012172100 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) | International search | [A]JPH09240727 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [A] 1-8 * claims *; | [A]JP2012131933 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-8 * claims, paragraph [0014], [0047] *; | [A]JP2012172100 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-8 * claims, paragraphs [0022], [0025], [0048], [0051], examples *; | [A]WO2018235835 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP])[A] 1-8 |