Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
22.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
07.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.05.2023 | Change - representative | |
17.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |