Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023368313 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 | WO2021JP42558 | 19.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230091976 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 | WO2021JP42558 | 19.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7429308B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | B2 | JPWO2022113894 | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 | WO2021JP42558 | 19.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116438557 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 | WO2021JP42558 | 19.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4254284 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 | WO2021JP42558 | 19.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022113894 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020194749 | 24.11.2020 |