EP4254284 - SUPPLY METHOD DETERMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, Higashiueno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNO, Kousuke Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
IWASAKI, Ayato Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21897868.2 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021JP42558 | Priority number, date | JP20200194749 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020194749 | [2023/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022113894 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254284 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,KR);
G06Q50/04 (US);
G06Q10/0631 (KR);
G06Q10/06315 (US);
G06Q10/0637 (KR);
G06Q10/06393 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G06Q50/08 (KR);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES VERSORGUNGSVERFAHRENS | [2023/40] | English: | SUPPLY METHOD DETERMINATION DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE PROCÉDÉ D'APPROVISIONNEMENT | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002366220 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]WO2014128845 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2015225351 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2017182448 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [AX]JP2020071502 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2017182448 |