EP4252552 - COMPOSITION FOR GELLED FOOD, AND GELLED FOOD HAVING PLURALITY OF LAYERS COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIM, Hee Ryung Seoul 04560 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Suk Young Seoul 04560 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Ji Hyeon Seoul 04560 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Hong Wook Seoul 04560 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Ki Moon Seoul 04560 / KR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | Mummery, Thomas Zack Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21898758.4 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021KR17923 | Priority number, date | KR20200165160 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200165160 | [2023/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022114933 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4252552 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/20, A23L29/256, A23L29/238, A23L21/00, A23L21/10 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
A23L29/238 (EP,KR,US);
A23L29/20 (KR);
A23L29/256 (EP,KR,US);
A23L21/00 (KR);
A23L21/10 (EP);
A23L21/12 (US);
A23L29/27 (US);
A23P20/20 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | A23L29/20, A23L29/256, A23L29/238, A23L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GELIERTES NAHRUNGSMITTEL UND GELIERTES NAHRUNGSMITTEL MIT MEHREREN SCHICHTEN DAMIT | [2023/40] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR GELLED FOOD, AND GELLED FOOD HAVING PLURALITY OF LAYERS COMPRISING SAME | [2023/40] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ALIMENT GÉLIFIÉ, ET ALIMENT GÉLIFIÉ COMPORTANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE COUCHES LA COMPRENANT | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | Translation filed | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004201538 (SANEI GEN FFI INC); | [XY]JP2004313123 (SANEI GEN FFI INC); | [A]US2007160707 (GARCIA ALBERT X [ES]); | [Y]JP2018108045 (POKKA SAPPRO FOOD & BEVERAGE LTD); | [A]JP2018191654 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD) | by applicant | KR0166638B |