EP4258045 - POLARIZER STRUCTURE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AMOUNT OF INCOMING LIGHT OF TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaoliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21899810.2 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN129215 | Priority number, date | CN202011409767 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011409767 | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022116776 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258045 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
G02F1/0136 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/286 (US);
G02F1/0121 (US);
H10K59/50 (CN);
G02F2203/01 (EP);
G02F2203/07 (EP);
H10K59/8791 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | G02F1/01, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | POLARISATORSTRUKTUR, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER MENGE AN EINFALLENDEM LICHT EINER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/41] | English: | POLARIZER STRUCTURE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AMOUNT OF INCOMING LIGHT OF TERMINAL DEVICE | [2023/41] | French: | STRUCTURE DE POLARISEUR, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE LA QUANTITÉ DE LUMIÈRE ENTRANTE D'UN DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2023 | Translation filed | 31.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |