Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4257587 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2021391153 CA3203014 CN2021134929W CN202180007569 CN202310255316 EP21900042 JP2023533984 KR20237022072 US202118039959



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024101548Global Dossier 28.03.2024A1
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230117180Global Dossier 07.08.2023A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024504239Global Dossier 31.01.2024A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116283954Global Dossier 23.06.2023A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
CN202180007569 02.12.2021
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114901656BGlobal Dossier 07.04.2023B
CN114901656 12.08.2022A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3203014Global Dossier 09.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2021391153Global Dossier 09.01.2025A9
AU2021391153 06.07.2023A1
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4257587Global Dossier 08.01.2025A4
EP4257587 11.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2023006504 21.06.2023A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
WO2021CN134929 02.12.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022117016Global Dossier 09.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202229270 01.08.2022A
Priority number Date
CN202110758372 05.07.2021
CN202011389148 02.12.2020