Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
13.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
14.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.06.2023 | Change - representative | |
02.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.11.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |