EP4255192 - BACTERIAL CELLULOSE BASED UMBILICAL CORD RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yildiz Teknik Üniversitesi Davutpasa Mah. Davutpasa Caddesi Esenler 34220 Istanbul / TR | For all designated states Saglik Bilimleri Üniversitesi Mekteb-i Tibbiye-i Sahane (Haydarpasa) Külliyesi Selimiye Mah. Tibbiye Cad. No:38 34668 Uskudar/Istanbul / TR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHIN, Yücel Esenler/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
BÜYÜKKAYHAN, Derya 34668 Uskudar/Istanbul / TR | 03 /
TÜRKOGLU, Nelisa Esenler/Istanbul / TR | 04 /
GÜRSU, Hürmüs Esenler/Istanbul / TR | 05 /
ESENTÜRK, Imren 34668 Üsküdar/Istanbul / TR | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Genç Ilhan, Oznur Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza 33, Buyukdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 21901181.4 | 02.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021TR51334 | Priority number, date | TR20200019774 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: TR 202019774 | [2023/41] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022119545 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4255192 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01P1/00, A61L27/54, A61K47/38, C08B15/00, A61L15/46, A61L15/60, A61K9/70 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP);
A61K47/38 (EP);
A61L15/46 (EP);
A61L15/60 (EP);
C08L1/02 (EP);
A61L2300/108 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L1/02 (EP);
C08K5/31, C08L1/02 (EP);
C08K3/042, C08L1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | A01P1/00, A61L27/54, A61K47/38, C08B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | NABELSCHNURRING AUF BASIS VON BAKTERIELLER CELLULOSE | [2023/41] | English: | BACTERIAL CELLULOSE BASED UMBILICAL CORD RING | [2023/41] | French: | ANNEAU DE CORDON OMBILICAL À BASE DE CELLULOSE BACTÉRIENNE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN104666317 (ARNOKANG NINGXIA BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]WO2019036551 (LAVON GARY DEAN [US]); | International search | [A]JPH10108869 (TOA MEDEISAIENSU KK) [A] 1-17 * All document *; | [A]CN110269957 (TIANJIN SAIERKANG BIOLOGICAL MEDICINE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * All document *; | [A] - Wang Bo, Li Peng, Shangguan Lei, Ma Jun, Mao Kezheng, Zhang Quan, Wang Yiguo, Liu Zhongyang, Mao Keya, "A novel bacterial cellulose membrane immobilized with human umbilical cord mesenchymal stem cells-derived exosome prevents epidural fibrosis", International Journal of Nanomedicine, (20180101), Volume 13, doi:10.2147/IJN.S167880, pages 5257 - 5273, XP055972390 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/IJN.S167880 |