EP4104505 - NETWORK-BASED MEDIA PROCESSING (NBMP) DEPLOYMENT WITH FRAMEWORK FOR LIVE UPLINK STREAMING (FLUS) AND 5G APPLICATION FUNCTION (AF) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SODAGAR, Iraj Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21901202.8 | 22.09.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US51558 | Priority number, date | US202063121830P | 04.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063121830 P | US202117472297 | 10.09.2021 Original published format: US202117472297 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022119617 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104505 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4104505 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/10, H04H60/07, H04L9/40, H04L65/612, H04L65/75, H04L65/80 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H04L65/765 (EP,KR);
H04L65/612 (EP,KR);
H04L65/65 (US);
H04L65/1063 (US);
H04L65/1069 (KR,US);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04W28/10, H04H60/07, H04L9/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSATZ EINER NETZWERKBASIERTEN MEDIENVERARBEITUNG (NBMP) MIT RAHMENWERK FÜR LIVE-UPLINK-STREAMING (FLUS) UND 5G-ANWENDUNGSFUNKTION (AF) | [2022/51] | English: | NETWORK-BASED MEDIA PROCESSING (NBMP) DEPLOYMENT WITH FRAMEWORK FOR LIVE UPLINK STREAMING (FLUS) AND 5G APPLICATION FUNCTION (AF) | [2022/51] | French: | DÉPLOIEMENT DE TRAITEMENT MULTIMÉDIA BASÉ SUR UN RÉSEAU (NBMP) AVEC CADRE DESTINÉ À UNE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU EN LIAISON MONTANTE EN DIRECT (FLUS) ET FONCTION D'APPLICATION EN 5G (AF) | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2022 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018367579 (KOLAN PRAKASH [US], et al); | [XY]WO2020092174 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [Y]WO2020102296 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2020166323 (SONY CORP [JP]); | US2022124139 [ ] (YAMAGISHI YASUAKI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]US2018367579 (KOLAN PRAKASH [US], et al); | [XY]WO2020092174 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [Y]WO2020102296 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2020166323 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [PX]US2021320955 (KOLAN PRAKASH [US]) |