EP4250800 - COMMUNICATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Chenghui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WU, Jianjun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21902696.0 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021CN136873 | Priority number, date | CN202011447020 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011447020 | [2023/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022121991 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4250800 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W76/27, H04L67/10, H04W4/40 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04W4/40 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/5083 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | H04W24/02, H04W76/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2023/39] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2023/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | Translation filed | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103702384 (UNIV BEIHANG); | [A]US2015038188 (GUPTA MANOJ [US], et al); | [X]CN108566408 (MIGU CULTURE TECH CO LTD, et al); | [A]WO2020222505 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XI]WO2020224492 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |