EP4253555 - PLASTIC-DEGRADING MICROORGANISM SCREENING MEDIUM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology 141, Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34114 / KR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Dong Yeop Daejeon 34114 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jeyoung Daejeon 34114 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Sung Yeon Daejeon 34114 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Gi Young Daejeon 34114 / KR | 05 /
KOO, Jun Mo Daejeon 34114 / KR | 06 /
JEON, Hyeon Yeol Daejeon 34114 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Sejin Daejeon 34114 / KR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Behr, Wolfgang Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21903700.9 | 25.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021KR17499 | Priority number, date | KR20200170235 | 08.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200170235 | [2023/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022124654 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253555 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, C12N5/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/045 (EP,KR);
C12N5/0018 (EP,KR);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | SCREENING-MEDIUM FÜR KUNSTSTOFFABBAUENDE MIKROORGANISMEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/40] | English: | PLASTIC-DEGRADING MICROORGANISM SCREENING MEDIUM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/40] | French: | MILIEU DE CRIBLAGE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES DÉGRADANT LES MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2023 | Translation filed | 30.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2013209587 (KANEKA CORP); | [XY]EP3587557 (SUH DONG EUN [KR]); | International search | [A]US2012107900 (GREINER ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]KR20180090558 (SUH DONG EUN [KR], et al); |