EP4260939 - SUPPORTED CATALYST FOR MANUFACTURING CARBON NANOTUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/42] | For all designated states Lg Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung Jin Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Se Hyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Hyun Woo Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Jung Ho Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Hyun Joon Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21903845.2 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021KR18551 | Priority number, date | KR20200173605 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200173605 | [2023/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022124799 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260939 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/847, B01J21/04, B01J23/74, B01J37/02, C01B32/162, B01J35/40 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B01J21/04 (EP);
B01J37/0215 (KR);
B01J23/8472 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J23/74 (EP);
B01J23/84 (KR);
B01J23/881 (KR);
B01J23/882 (KR);
B01J23/883 (KR);
B01J35/394 (US);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J35/50 (US);
B01J37/0201 (EP);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
B01J37/082 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | B01J37/02, B01J23/84, B01J23/881, B01J23/882, B01J23/883, B01J23/847, C01B32/162 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | TRÄGERKATALYSATOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHREN | [2023/42] | English: | SUPPORTED CATALYST FOR MANUFACTURING CARBON NANOTUBE | [2023/42] | French: | CATALYSEUR SUPPORTÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2023 | Translation filed | 14.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1674154 (NANOCYL SA [BE]); | [Y]EP3053878 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XYI]JP2019005721 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2008521008 ; | [A]KR20140037441 (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20140140530 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20160036910 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XY]JP2019005721 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [PX]KR20210036725 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20100074002 |