EP4261321 - HIGH-STRENGTH GALVANNEALED STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT POWDERING RESISTANCE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HA, Yu-Mi Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 02 /
YEOM, Jun-Sung Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Ji-Ho Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/42] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21903858.5 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021KR18612 | Priority number, date | KR20200173353 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200173353 | [2023/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022124812 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261321 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/28, C23C2/06, B32B15/01, C23C2/02, C22C38/14, C23C2/26, C21D8/02, C22C38/16, C21D9/46, C23C2/40, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, // B21B27/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
C23C2/02 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/06 (KR,US);
C23C2/024 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D8/0221 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0273 (EP);
C21D8/0278 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (KR,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (KR,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/022 (KR);
C23C2/0224 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/29 (KR);
C23C2/40 (KR);
C23C2/52 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | C23C2/28, C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C2/26, C23C2/40, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES GALVANNEALED-STAHLBLECH MIT HERVORRAGENDER BESTÄUBUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/42] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH GALVANNEALED STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT POWDERING RESISTANCE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/42] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER RECUITE PAR GALVANISATION À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE AU POUDRAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2023 | Translation filed | 21.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004003247 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2007007983 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [A]JP2013076132 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2014015651 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]KR101449135B | International search | [A]JPH03274251 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9 * See claim 1. *; | [A]JPH08165551 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0007] and claims 1-2. *; | [XY]JP2001279409 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * See paragraph [0024], claims 1-3 and table 4. * [Y] 8-9; | [Y]JP2002060917 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [Y] 9 * See claim 2 and table 1. *; | [A]KR101449135B (POSCO) [A] 1-9* See claims 1 and 4-5. *; | [Y]JP2015101776 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [Y] 8 * See paragraph [0092] and claim 10. * | by applicant | JP2695259B |