EP4230927 - CONNECTION AND CONTROL BOARD FOR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AND ADAPTIVE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Electric Science and Technology Co., Ltd. No. 8, Xinye 4th Road Pioneer Park Shunjiang Neigborhood Committee Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | For all designated states GD Midea Air-Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd. Lingang Road Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHEN, Jinpeng Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Cheng Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zhongzheng Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 04 /
YU, Weiyou Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 05 /
HUO, Junya Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Wenkai Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21905020.0 | 12.07.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021CN105787 | Priority number, date | CN202011480577 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011480577 | [2023/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022127087 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230927 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/89, F24F11/88, F24F11/58, F24F11/52, F24F1/0003, F24F11/49, F24F140/10, F24F11/30, F24F11/54, F24F11/56 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
F24F1/0003 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/89 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F11/49 (EP);
F24F11/52 (CN);
F24F11/54 (EP);
F24F11/56 (EP,US);
F24F11/58 (CN);
F24F11/88 (EP,CN,US);
F24F2140/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | F24F11/89, F24F11/88, F24F11/58, F24F11/52, F24F1/0003 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSS- UND STEUERTAFEL FÜR EIN KLIMAANLAGENSYSTEM, KLIMAANLAGENSYSTEM UND ADAPTIVES STEUERVERFAHREN | [2023/34] | English: | CONNECTION AND CONTROL BOARD FOR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AND ADAPTIVE CONTROL METHOD | [2023/34] | French: | CARTE DE CONNEXION ET DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION, SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ADAPTATIVE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2023 | Translation filed | 17.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]ES2248150T (DAIKIN IND LTD) [I] 1,6,11,12* abstract *; | [IA]CN105318488 (PANASONIC CORP) [I] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * abstract * [A] 3,8; | [IA]US2019346166 (KOIZUMI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 19] - [0039] - [0 44] - [0051] - [0054] - [0056]; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,8 |