EP4265825 - CUP-SHAPED CHUCK OF SUBSTRATE HOLDING DEVICE, AND SUBSTRATE HOLDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACM Research (Shanghai) Inc. Building 4, No. 1690 Cai Lun Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hui Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Zhaowei Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Yinuo Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Hongchao Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21905444.2 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021CN131846 | Priority number, date | CN202011502680 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011502680 | [2023/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022127515 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265825 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/08 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C25D17/001 (EP,KR);
C25D17/08 (CN,KR);
C25D17/06 (EP,US);
C25D17/004 (EP);
C25D17/005 (EP);
C25D7/12 (CN,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | BECHERFÖRMIGES SPANNFUTTER EINER SUBSTRATHALTEVORRICHTUNG UND SUBSTRATHALTEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/43] | English: | CUP-SHAPED CHUCK OF SUBSTRATE HOLDING DEVICE, AND SUBSTRATE HOLDING DEVICE | [2023/43] | French: | MANDRIN EN FORME DE COUPELLE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE SUBSTRAT, ET DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE SUBSTRAT | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | Translation filed | 10.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |