EP4265608 - BENZOHETEROCYCLE SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Jemincare Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 1st Floor, Block 1 No. 1118 Halei Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Jiangxi Jemincare Group Co., Ltd. No.3333 Yaohu North Avenue High-tech Industries Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330000 / CN | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Shuchun Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Jun Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WU, Nan Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
FANG, Zhihua Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
SHI, Wenqiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Yang Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
PENG, Jianbiao Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
GUO, Haibing Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21905840.1 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021CN139314 | Priority number, date | CN202011508096 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011508096 | CN202110266745 | 11.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110266745 | CN202111523273 | 13.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111523273 | [2023/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022127917 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265608 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/4725, A61P9/04, A61P13/12 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K31/4725 (IL,KR);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K31/5415 (KR);
A61K47/545 (US);
A61P1/00 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P1/16 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P13/12 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P37/08 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P9/04 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D217/24 (CN,IL);
C07D403/14 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D405/14 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D471/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | BENZOHETEROCYCLISCH SUBSTITUIERTE TETRAHYDROISOCHINOLINVERBINDUNG | [2023/43] | English: | BENZOHETEROCYCLE SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE COMPOUND | [2023/43] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE TÉTRAHYDROISOQUINOLÉINE SUBSTITUÉ PAR UN BENZOHÉTÉROCYCLE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2023 | Translation filed | 17.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |