EP4265778 - WIRE ROD AND STEEL WIRE FOR SPRING, SPRING, HAVING IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE AND NITRIFICATION PROPERTIES, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Junmo Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37836 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Seok-hwan Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37904 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Myungsoo Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37669 / KR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21906897.0 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021KR16990 | Priority number, date | KR20200177749 | 17.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200177749 | [2023/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022131592 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265778 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/34, C22C38/24, C22C38/22, C21D9/52, C21D8/06, B21F3/02, B21F35/00, F16F1/04 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/34 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/525 (EP,US);
B21F3/02 (KR,US);
B21F35/00 (KR);
C21D1/18 (US);
C21D1/20 (EP);
C21D1/25 (EP);
C21D1/76 (EP);
C21D1/84 (US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D7/13 (EP);
C21D8/065 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/02 (EP);
C21D9/52 (KR);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (US);
C22C38/22 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,KR,US);
F16F1/021 (EP);
F16F1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/001 (US);
C21D2211/004 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | WALZDRAHT UND STAHLDRAHT FÜR FEDER, FEDER MIT VERBESSERTER ERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND NITRIFIKATIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/43] | English: | WIRE ROD AND STEEL WIRE FOR SPRING, SPRING, HAVING IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE AND NITRIFICATION PROPERTIES, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/43] | French: | FIL MACHINE ET FIL D'ACIER POUR RESSORT, RESSORT, AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS DE RÉSISTANCE À LA FATIGUE ET DE NITRIFICATION AMÉLIORÉES, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | Translation filed | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004315968 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* See claims 1 and 6. *; | [A]US2009283181 (SUDA SUMIE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 11 and 18. *; | [Y]KR101096888B (SUMITOMO(SEI)STEEL WIRE CORP) [Y] 7-10 * See claim 12. *; | [XY]KR20120040728 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,11-15 * See paragraphs [0149], [0169], [0207], [0209]-[0210], [0248]-[0249] and [0271] and claims 1-2, 5, 8, 10, 12 and 14. * [Y] 7-10; | [X]KR20180019212 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 11 * See claim 1. * |