EP4265672 - NYLON FILM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND ALUMINUM POUCH FILM COMPRISING SAME FOR SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SBTL Advanced Materials Co. Ltd. 634-93, Ssangbong-ro, Ujeong-eup Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18559 / KR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIM, Jun Ho Seoul 08329 / KR | 02 /
CHUN, Sang Wook Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18442 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung Il Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31114 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Pill Gyu Daejeon 34404 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Soon Sik Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 28121 / KR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21907006.7 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021KR18772 | Priority number, date | KR20200179030 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200179030 | KR20210163354 | 24.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210163354 | [2023/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022131702 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265672 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08K3/04, C08K9/04, H01M50/124, H01M50/105, H01M50/126 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C08J3/203 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR);
B32B15/08 (KR);
B32B15/088 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C08K3/042 (EP,KR);
C08K9/02 (US);
C08K9/04 (KR);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C08L77/06 (EP);
H01M50/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/1245 (KR);
H01M50/126 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/155 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29K2105/162 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2264/108 (EP);
B32B2264/301 (EP);
B32B2264/302 (EP);
B32B2307/408 (EP);
B32B2307/746 (EP,US);
B32B2457/10 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP);
C08J2377/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/042, C08L77/02 (EP);
C08K3/042, C08L77/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | NYLONFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND ALUMINIUMBEUTELFOLIE DAMIT FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/43] | English: | NYLON FILM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND ALUMINUM POUCH FILM COMPRISING SAME FOR SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/43] | French: | FILM DE NYLON, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET FILM DE POCHE D'ALUMINIUM LE COMPRENANT POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2023 | Translation filed | 21.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20160116299 (CHEORWON PLASMA RES INST [KR]); | [A]CN106832899 (HANGZHOU GAOXI TECH CO LTD); | [Y]KR101974046B (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR]); | [A]CN110564142 (XIAMEN CHANGSU IND CO LTD); | [Y]KR20200096494 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | KR20200179030 | KR20210163354 | KR20160077968 |