EP4239497 - IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Guimin Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21909216.0 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021CN137662 | Priority number, date | CN202011521995 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011521995 | [2023/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022135219 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239497 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/54, G06F3/0481, G06F3/04817, G06F3/0482, G06F3/04842, G06F3/04845 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,CN);
G06F16/54 (EP,CN,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (CN);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN);
G06F3/04845 (EP);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | G06F16/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/36] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2023 | Translation filed | 01.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 13.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010199227 (XIAO JUN [US], et al); | [XI]US2013044921 (IN SEUNGHEE [KR], et al) |