EP4270607 - POWER GENERATION METHOD AND POWER GENERATION ELEMENT USING HUMIDITY VARIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMAZAKI, Yusuke Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 02 /
Kanazawa, Kenji Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 03 /
Nobeshima, Taiki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 04 /
Hirama, Hirotada Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 05 /
Watanabe, Yuichi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 06 /
UEMURA, Sei Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21909907.4 | 13.10.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021JP37960 | Priority number, date | JP20200212853 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020212853 | [2023/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022137749 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270607 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M14/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H02N11/002 (KR);
H01M12/02 (US);
H01M12/065 (US);
H01M14/00 (EP,KR);
H01M4/06 (US);
H01M4/582 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND STROMERZEUGUNGSELEMENT MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSVARIATION | [2023/44] | English: | POWER GENERATION METHOD AND POWER GENERATION ELEMENT USING HUMIDITY VARIATION | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ET ÉLÉMENT DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE UTILISANT LA VARIATION D'HUMIDITÉ | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2023 | Translation filed | 17.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11317247 (ORGANO KK) [A] 1-11 * claim 1, paragraph [0002] *; | [A]US2014349211 (WEI DI [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0051], fig. 3, 7 *; | [PX] - Komazaki Yusuke, Kanazawa Kenji, Nobeshima Taiki, Hirama Hirotada, Watanabe Yuichi, Suemori Kouji, Uemura Sei, "ENERGY HARVESTING BY AMBIENT HUMIDITY VARIATION WITH CONTINUOUS MILLIAMPERE CURRENT OUTPUT AND ENERGY STORATGE", SUSTAINABLE ENERGY & FUELS, (20210602), vol. 5, no. 14, doi:10.1039/D1SE00562F, pages 3570 - 3577, XP055947054 [PX] 1-11 * INTRODUCTION, fig.1, 4-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/D1SE00562F | by applicant | JP2018049833 |