EP4265701 - ADHESIVE COATING COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET, ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET LAMINATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HA, Bongwoo Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jungwoo Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Donggyu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 04 /
NO, Taeyoung Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Gyeongryeol Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21911395.8 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021KR19204 | Priority number, date | KR20200179816 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200179816 | [2023/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022139328 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265701 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, C09J4/06, B32B37/12, B32B15/01 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/7621 (EP);
C09J175/04 (KR);
C09J175/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/011 (EP,KR);
B32B15/043 (US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B37/12 (KR);
B32B7/12 (US);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/4825 (EP,US);
C08G18/7614 (US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C09J4/06 (KR);
B32B2255/06 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | HAFTBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ELEKTROSTAHLBLECH, ELEKTROSTAHLBLECHLAMINAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/43] | English: | ADHESIVE COATING COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET, ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET LAMINATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/43] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT ADHÉSIF POUR TÔLE D'ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE, STRATIFIÉ DE TÔLE D'ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | Translation filed | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0153423 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP], et al); | [X]EP1369443 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]WO2013161972 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]); | [X]WO2013180252 (HENKEL JAPAN LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2016142513 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al); | [XP]EP3892697 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]); | [E]EP4269515 (POSCO CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20000041674 (PO HANG IRON & STEEL); | [X]JP2004501252 ; | [A]KR100819016B ; | [A]JP2010529282 ; | [A]KR101128156B |