EP4267165 - TRANSDERMAL PATCHES FOR HANGOVER MINIMIZATION AND/OR RECOVERY, AND/OR SLEEP IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gamechanger Patch Co. 10228 E. Northwest Hwy. Suite 246 Dallas, TX 75238 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USREY, Christopher Dallas, TX 75238 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Sach, Greg Robert C/o KA Filing (EU) Limited Valet Patent Services Limited Landberger Str. 302 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21912103.5 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US64747 | Priority number, date | US202063130367P | 23.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063130367 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022140480 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267165 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/28, A61K31/352, A61P25/32 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/7038 (EP);
A61K9/7092 (US);
A61F13/00063 (EP);
A61K31/185 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/385 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/33 (EP);
A61K36/48 (EP);
A61K36/73 (EP);
A61K36/754 (EP);
A61K36/9068 (EP);
A61K38/063 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/7053 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/385, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/33, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/73, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/754, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/9068, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE PFLASTER ZUR KATERMINIMIERUNG UND/ODER -ERHOLUNG UND/ODER SCHLAFVERBESSERUNG | [2023/44] | English: | TRANSDERMAL PATCHES FOR HANGOVER MINIMIZATION AND/OR RECOVERY, AND/OR SLEEP IMPROVEMENT | [2023/44] | French: | TIMBRES TRANSDERMIQUES POUR LA RÉDUCTION ET/OU LA RÉCUPÉRATION DE LA GUEULE DE BOIS, ET/OU L'AMÉLIORATION DU SOMMEIL | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/44] | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 24.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4594276 (RELYEA KEITH E [US]) [A] 8, 18 * ; abstract; column 2, lines 24-31; column 3, lines 55-58 *; | [Y]WO9102553 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [Y] 7, 17 * ; page 7, fourth paragraph; page 14, second paragraph, Example 1 *; | [A]WO02076379 (LIPPER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 8, 18 * ; page 4, lines 14-22 *; | [A]WO2006104941 (SILGUERO KANDY [US], et al) [A] 8, 18 * ; claims 1, 5 *; | [A]US2007134169 (RABINOFF MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1-20* ; paragraphs [0008], [0010] *; | [YA]US2011086086 (JOHNSON BARBARA ALICE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6-7, 9-13, 16-17, 19-20 * ; paragraphs [0006]-[0007], [0012], [0015], [0060] * [A] 4-5, 8, 14-15, 18; | [A]US2011217392 (THORSBY CASON [US], et al) [A] 4-5 * ; paragraphs [0009], [0060] *; | [YA]WO2012027603 (CLARITY PRODUCTS LTD LIABILITY COMPANY [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6-7, 9-13, 16-17,19-20 * ; page 3, lines 9-17; page 8, lines 10-13 * [A] 4-5; | [A]US2020022949 (DAVIS JENNIFER [US]) [A] 14-15 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0029], Table 2 *; | [A]US2020330426 (POWELL BROOKS ALEXANDER REID [US]) [A] 14-15 * ; paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0031] *; | [YA]WO2020247961 (ADVANCED DELIVERY LABS LLC [US]) [Y] 3, 13 * ; paragraphs [0001], [0031]-[0034], [0038], [0045], [0052], [0058], [0070], [0090], [0093] * [A] 4-5, 14-15 |