EP4207434 - WET SEPARATION PROCESS FOR WASTE LITHIUM BATTERIES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunan Brunp Recycling Technology Co., Ltd. No. 018 Jinsha East Road, Jinzhou New District Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | For all designated states Guangdong Brunp Recycling Technology Co., Ltd No. 6 Zhixin Avenue Leping Town Shanshui District Foshan, Guangdong 528137 / CN | For all designated states Hunan Brunp EV Recycling Co., Ltd. No. 018 Jinsha East Road Jinzhou New District Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Jieming Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | 02 /
GONG, Qinxue Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Ruokui Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | 04 /
LI, Qiang Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | 05 /
LI, Changdong Changsha, Hunan 410604 / CN | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Nex & Phister Law & IP Aps Symbion Fuglebakken Nordre Fasanvej 215 2000 Fredriksberg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Nex & Phister Law & IP Aps Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Application number, filing date | 21912828.7 | 13.05.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021CN93664 | Priority number, date | CN202011584671 | 28.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011584671 | [2023/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022142067 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207434 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/54, B03B7/00, H01M6/52, // B03B9/06 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H01M10/54 (EP,CN);
B03B9/00 (CN);
B07B15/00 (US);
B03B1/00 (CN);
B03B7/00 (EP);
B03C1/005 (US);
B09B3/35 (US);
H01M6/52 (EP);
B03B2009/066 (EP);
B07B2220/04 (US);
B07B2230/01 (US);
B09B2101/16 (US);
Y02W30/84 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | H01M10/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Validation states | MA | 29.03.2023 | Title | German: | NASSTRENNVERFAHREN FÜR LITHIUM-ALTBATTERIEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/27] | English: | WET SEPARATION PROCESS FOR WASTE LITHIUM BATTERIES AND USE THEREOF | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION PAR VOIE HUMIDE POUR BATTERIES AU LITHIUM USAGÉES ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | Translation filed | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN105671316 (UNIV JIANGXI SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0016]; figure 1 *; | [A]CN108400400 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0038]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN111468284 (CHINA ENFI ENG CORP) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0039]; examples 6-8 *; | [T] - Schlanz ET AL, "Grinding: An Overview of Operation and Design", Blog of Mineral Processing (Metallurgy), (19871001), URL: https://www.911metallurgist.com/blog/wp-content/uploads/2016/06/Grinding-Circuit-Design.pdf, (20191014), XP055631569 [T] 1-10 * pages 16-18; figures 8-10 * | International search | [A]CN102218370 (DAYE NONFERROUS DESIGN & RES INST CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN105671316 (UNIV JIANGXI SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0006]-[0009], and figure 1 *; | [A]JP2017037807 (UNIV WASEDA, et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [Y]CN111468284 (CHINA ENFI ENG CORP) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0039], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN111534697 (CHINA ENFI ENG CORP) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [PX]CN112756104 (HUNAN BRUNP RECYCLING TECH CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | CN111534697 |