EP4247050 - NETWORK SLICE CONNECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Cheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21913484.8 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021CN129363 | Priority number, date | CN202011608100 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011608100 | [2023/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022142740 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4247050 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W48/18, H04W28/16, // H04W12/06 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,CN);
H04W48/08 (CN,US);
H04W48/16 (CN);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W12/033 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04W28/16, H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | NETZWERKSCHICHTVERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/38] | English: | NETWORK SLICE CONNECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONNEXION DE TRANCHE DE RÉSEAU, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | Translation filed | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019007345 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]US2020382605 (OUYANG GUOWEI [CN], et al) |