blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4243427

EP4243427 - VIDEO GENERATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.09.2024
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.07.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2025New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Zitiao Network Technology Co., Ltd.
0207, 2/F, Building 4
Zijin Digital Park
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
[2023/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Junqiang
Beijing 100190 / CN
02 / ZHENG, Ziyang
Beijing 100190 / CN
03 / GUAN, Weihong
Beijing 100190 / CN
04 / LV, Haitao
Beijing 100190 / CN
05 / LIN, Wanling
Beijing 100190 / CN
06 / YE, Jiali
Beijing 100190 / CN
07 / LIN, Weiwen
Beijing 100190 / CN
08 / LI, Yang
Beijing 100190 / CN
09 / ZHANG, Zhanchen
Beijing 100190 / CN
10 / ZENG, Yingwen
Beijing 100190 / CN
11 / CHE, Xin
Beijing 100190 / CN
 [2023/37]
Representative(s)Dentons UK and Middle East LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[2023/37]
Application number, filing date21913994.620.12.2021
[2023/37]
WO2021CN139606
Priority number, dateCN20201162626431.12.2020         Original published format: CN202011626264
[2023/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022143253
Date:07.07.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4243427
Date:13.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.07.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:H04N21/44, H04N21/472, H04N21/4788, G11B27/036
[2024/10]
CPC:
G11B27/036 (EP,US); H04N21/44016 (EP,CN); H04N21/472 (EP);
H04N21/47205 (EP,CN); H04N21/4788 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2023/37]H04N21/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/37]
TitleGerman:VIDEOERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2023/37]
English:VIDEO GENERATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2023/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2023/37]
Entry into regional phase08.06.2023Translation filed 
08.06.2023National basic fee paid 
08.06.2023Search fee paid 
08.06.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2023Examination requested  [2023/37]
19.08.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.08.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.09.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2025Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2020236297  (SHABUROV VICTOR [GI], et al);
 [A]WO2020150692  (SNAP INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.