EP4273750 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTING DEVICE, AND TEST SIMPLIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Mengyuan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21914355.9 | 28.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021CN141953 | Priority number, date | CN202011591254 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011591254 | [2023/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022143621 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273750 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/09, G06N3/0985, G06N20/10, G06F9/445, // G06N3/0442, G06N3/0455 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06F11/3688 (US);
G06F11/3692 (US);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G06N20/10 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06N3/0985 (EP);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/0455 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N5/00, G06N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, RECHNERVORRICHTUNG UND TESTVEREINFACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/45] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTING DEVICE, AND TEST SIMPLIFICATION DEVICE | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE SIMPLIFICATION DE TEST | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2023 | Translation filed | 25.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018222204 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) |