EP4272771 - FOLD RESISTANT DEHYDRATED CROSS-LINKED BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venus MedTech (HangZhou), Inc. Room 311, Floor 3, Building 2 No.88 Jiangling Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Xing Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 02 /
LIM, Hou-Sen Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 03 /
KUANG, Dajun Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21914434.2 | 28.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021CN142206 | Priority number, date | CN202011621441 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011621441 | [2023/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022143700 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272771 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/50 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A61L27/3604 (EP,CN,US);
A61L27/3625 (CN);
A61L27/3687 (EP,CN,US);
A61L27/362 (CN);
A61L27/3629 (CN);
A61L27/50 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | FALZRESISTENTES DEHYDRIERTES VERNETZTES BIOLOGISCHES MATERIAL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/45] | English: | FOLD RESISTANT DEHYDRATED CROSS-LINKED BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2023/45] | French: | MATÉRIAU BIOLOGIQUE RÉTICULÉ DÉSHYDRATÉ RÉSISTANT AU PLIAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | Translation filed | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |