EP4261716 - BLOCKCHAIN-BASED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SDP ACCESS CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. RESEARCH INSTITUTE 32 Xuanwumen West Street Xicheng District Beijing 100053 / CN | For all designated states CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CO., LTD. 29, Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Junzhi Beijing 100053 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Bo Beijing 100053 / CN | 03 /
SU, Li Beijing 100053 / CN | 04 /
HE, Shen Beijing 100053 / CN | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21914665.1 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021CN143221 | Priority number, date | CN20211001453 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110001453 | [2023/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022143935 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261716 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, G06F21/45, G06F21/60, G06F21/64, H04L9/32, H04L9/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04L63/10 (EP);
G06F21/31 (CN);
G06F21/45 (CN);
G06F21/602 (CN);
G06F21/604 (CN);
G06F21/606 (EP);
G06F21/64 (EP,CN);
H04L63/0876 (EP,CN);
H04L63/102 (CN);
H04L63/1458 (CN);
H04L9/0861 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | G06F21/31, G06F21/45, G06F21/60, G06F21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | BLOCKCHAIN-BASIERTES VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SDP-ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG | [2023/42] | English: | BLOCKCHAIN-BASED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SDP ACCESS CONTROL | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME BASÉS SUR UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS POUR UN CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS SDP | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2023 | Translation filed | 13.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019207762 (XIE HUI [CN], et al); | [A]CN111181944 (CLOUDMINDS TECH INC); |