Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.10.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] |
06.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] |
11.09.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
26.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.12.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
09.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.07.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |