EP4274289 - TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBOI, Hidekazu Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Shohei Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
HORI, Takako Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Kyosuke Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21915262.6 | 27.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021JP48466 | Priority number, date | JP20200219734 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020219734 | [2023/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022145402 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274289 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/32, H04W72/04, H04W76/25 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W76/25 (EP,US);
H04W72/231 (US);
H04W76/34 (US);
H04W16/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2023/45] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND METHOD | [2023/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2023 | Translation filed | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - vivo, "Efficient activation/deactivation mechanism for SCG and SCells", 3GPP Draft; R2-2007215, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200807), vol. RAN WG2, no. electronic; 20200817 - 20200828, XP051912016 [X] 1-3 * section 2 * | [A] - Ericsson, "Efficient SCG (de)activation", 3GPP Draft; R2-2010062, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201022), vol. RAN WG2, no. Electronic meeting; 20201102 - 20201113, XP051941529 [A] 1-3 * sections 2.3-2.4 * | by applicant | JP2020219734 | - "NR; NR and NG-RAN Overall description; Stage 2", 3GPP TS 38.300, pages 10 - 134 | - "Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2", 3GPP TS 36.300, pages 19 - 361 | - "NR; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specifications", 3GPP TS 38.331, pages 21 - 861 | - "Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specifications", 3GPP TS 36.331, pages 25 - 1012 | - "Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and NR; Multi-Connectivity; Stage 2", 3GPP TS 37.340, pages 6 - 67 | - "NR; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification", 3GPP TS 38.321, pages 8 - 148 |