EP4273304 - SURFACE-TREATED COPPER FOIL AND CIRCUIT BOARD COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKC Co., Ltd. 84, Jangan-ro 309beon-gil Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16336 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Il Hwan Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Joo Young Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | 03 /
KYUN, Myung Ok Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | 04 /
RYU, Ji Yeon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | 05 /
OH, Seung Bae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21915577.7 | 06.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021KR18342 | Priority number, date | KR20200187233 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200187233 | [2023/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022145779 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273304 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/00, C25D1/04, H05K3/38, H05K1/09 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H05K3/384 (EP);
C25D5/623 (EP,KR);
H05K3/022 (US);
C25D1/04 (KR);
C25D5/10 (EP);
C25D5/605 (EP);
C25D7/0614 (EP);
H05K1/0284 (US);
H05K1/09 (EP,KR);
H05K3/382 (KR);
C25D3/38 (EP);
H05K2201/0355 (EP);
H05K2201/09054 (US);
H05K2201/09972 (US);
H05K2203/0307 (EP);
H05K2203/0405 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE KUPFERFOLIE UND LEITERPLATTE DAMIT | [2023/45] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED COPPER FOIL AND CIRCUIT BOARD COMPRISING SAME | [2023/45] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE TRAITÉE EN SURFACE ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ LA COMPRENANT | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2023 | Translation filed | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005048277 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0020] and [0050]-[0051] and figures 1-2 and 5-7. *; | [YA]KR20060041689 (FURUKAWA CIRCUIT FOIL [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * See paragraph [0003], claims 1, 3 and 18 and figures 3-5. * [A] 2-9; | [A]JP2010114093 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0022] and claims 1-5. *; | [A]CN106103082 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [A] 1-10* See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20180109364 (KCF TECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,10 * See claim 1 and figure 1. * |