EP4254407 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND VOICE INPUT/OUTPUT CONTROL METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEO, Seungyoon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
AN, Jungyeol Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Taewoo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
WOO, Sunghwa Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Gangyoul Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21915831.8 | 29.12.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021KR20180 | Priority number, date | KR20200188907 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200188907 | [2023/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146033 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254407 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02, G10L19/26, G10L25/51, G10L15/22, G06F3/16, H04M9/08, // G10L21/0208, G10L25/06, H04R3/02 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP);
G10L21/02 (EP,KR);
G10L21/0232 (US);
G06F3/16 (EP);
G06F3/167 (KR);
G10L15/22 (EP,KR,US);
G10L15/28 (US);
G10L19/26 (EP,KR);
G10L25/06 (EP,US);
G10L25/51 (EP,KR);
G10L25/84 (US);
H04M9/082 (EP);
H04R3/00 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02082 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP);
H04R3/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | G10L21/02, G10L19/26, G10L25/51, G10L15/22, G06F3/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPRACHEINGABE-/-AUSGABESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND VOICE INPUT/OUTPUT CONTROL METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SORTIE/ENTRÉE VOCALE DU DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | Translation filed | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016227336 (SAKRI SHAILESH [US], et al); | [A]KR20170052056 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170076527 (KERI KOREA ELECTROTECHNOLOGY RES INST [KR]); | [A]US2018132038 (DICKINS GLENN N [AU], et al); | [I]US2019122687 (KIM CHOON-HO [KR], et al) | International search | [A]JP2007243722 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-10. *; | [YA]KR20170076527 (KERI KOREA ELECTROTECHNOLOGY RES INST [KR]) [Y] 1-8,11-15 * See paragraphs [0043] and [0089]; and claims 4 and 7. * [A] 9-10; | [A]US2017372722 (LI XILIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraph [0017]; and claims 1-3 and 5-8. *; | [Y]KR20190034807 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-8,11-15 * See paragraph [0048]; and claim 3. *; | [A]US2020133332 (PATTON RUSSELL DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-14. * |