Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024503329 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 | WO2021KR20328 | 30.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116964032 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 | WO2021KR20328 | 30.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4273122 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 | WO2021KR20328 | 30.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022146090 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220095868 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 |