EP4271694 - COMPOUND FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES AND ITS ISOLATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarawak Biodiversity Council KM20, Jalan Borneo Heights, Semengoh Locked Bag No. 3032 Kuching, Sarawak, 93990 / MY | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEO, Tiong Chia Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 02 /
VOONG, Julian, Cheng Liang Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 03 /
MAHIDI, Noreha Binti Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 04 /
KOTA, Mohd Farith bin Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 05 /
OTHMAN, Nuraqilah binti Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 06 /
MEJIN, Michele Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 07 /
KON, Nyuk Fong Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 08 /
AZRI, Mohammad Farhan Darin bin Sarawak, 93250 / MY | 09 /
GEORGE, Mitchel Constance ak Sarawak, 93250 / MY | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21915916.7 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021MY50126 | Priority number, date | MY2020PI07106 | 28.12.2020 Original published format: MYPI2020007106 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146137 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271694 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/203, C12N1/14, C12P1/02, C12R1/77, A61K31/7008, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A61P25/16 (EP,AU);
C07H15/203 (EP,AU);
A61K36/062 (AU);
A61P25/28 (EP,AU);
C12N1/145 (AU);
C12P1/02 (AU);
C12P19/44 (EP);
A61K2236/19 (AU);
A61K2236/33 (AU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEURODEGENERATIVER ERKRANKUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ISOLIERUNG | [2023/45] | English: | COMPOUND FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES AND ITS ISOLATION METHOD THEREOF | [2023/45] | French: | COMPOSÉ POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIVES ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLATION | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2730571 (UNIV BARCELONA [ES], et al) [A] 1-20* see abstract; [0001]-[0026] & claims 13 & 14 *; | [A] - HASHIMOTO, T. et al., "A highly efficient preparation of lunularic acid and some biological activities of stilbene and dihydrostilbene derivatives", Phytochemistry, (19880000), vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0031-9422(88)80599-5, pages 109 - 113, XP026604918 [A] 1-20 * see compounds 4 & 7 on page 110; abstract & introduction on page 109 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(88)80599-5 | [A] - Yonesu Kiyoaki, Ohnuki Takashi, Ono Yasunori, Takatsu Toshio, Nara Futoshi, "Ascotricins A and B, novel antagonists of sphingosine-1-phosphate receptor 1 from Ascotricha chartarum Berk. SANK 14186", The Journal of Antibiotics, London, (20090701), vol. 62, no. 7, doi:10.1038/ja.2009.40, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 359 - 364, XP055955183 [A] 1-20 * see compounds (1) and (2) in Figure 1 on page 360; Figure 5 on page 362; Figure 6 on page 362; abstract; introduction on page 359 and discussion on pages 362 & 363 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ja.2009.40 | [A] - Wang Ping, Zhang Zhaojun, Yu Biao, "Total Synthesis of CRM646-A and -B, Two Fungal Glucuronides with Potent Heparinase Inhibition Activities", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20051001), vol. 70, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jo051384k, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8884 - 8889, XP055955184 [A] 1-20 * see abstract; compound (1) and (2) on page 8885; intermediate compounds 37 & 38 in Scheme 6 on page 8887; introduction on page 8884 and conclusion on pages 8887 & 8888 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo051384k |