EP4272031 - DEVICE INCLUDING FERROELECTRIC NEMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL-FORMING MOLECULES AND METHODS OF FORMING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Noel A. Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Xi Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 03 /
MACLENNAN, Joseph E. Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 04 /
GLASER, Matthew A. Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21916483.7 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US65662 | Priority number, date | US202063132194P | 30.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063132194 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147232 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272031 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/141, G02F1/1337 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/141 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1337 (EP);
G02F1/133788 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT FERROELEKTRISCHEN NEMATISCHEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLBILDENDEN MOLEKÜLEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/45] | English: | DEVICE INCLUDING FERROELECTRIC NEMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL-FORMING MOLECULES AND METHODS OF FORMING AND USING SAME | [2023/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT DES MOLÉCULES DE FORMATION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES NÉMATIQUES FERROÉLECTRIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 20.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005024568 (CHOI SUK WON [KR], et al) [X] 1-7, 20-23, 37, 48, 49 * entire document; especially Fig. 8; para [0003], para [0015], para [0035]-[0036] *; | [A]US2015085224 (HSU HSU-KUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-7, 20-23, 37, 48, 49* entire document; *; | [A]US2016209720 (KOMPANETS IGOR NIKOLAEVICH [RU]) [A] 1-7, 20-23, 37, 48, 49 * entire document; * |