EP4141858 - DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yao Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Yudiao Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Cong Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Chapel Bar Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21916737.6 | 06.01.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021CN70439 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147679 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141858 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G09G3/3241 (EP);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (US);
G09G3/3275 (EP);
H10K59/121 (EP);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/1216 (US);
H10K59/65 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | G09G3/3225, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/09] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/09] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2022 | Translation filed | 23.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN111785761 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [I] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [I]CN111916486 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0111]; figures 1,2,16 * | International search | [A]CN109686762 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [A]CN111326560 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [X]CN111785761 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * description, page 2 - page 3, figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN111834425 (HEFEI VISIONOX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [X]CN111916486 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * description, page 3 - page 15, figures 1-22 *; | [A]CN111969027 (HEFEI VISIONOX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [A]CN112117320 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * entire document * |