EP4201781 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING TRAJECTORY OF VEHICLE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOU, Changxi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21917321.8 | 29.12.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN142314 | Priority number, date | CN20211019580 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110019580 | [2023/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022148282 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201781 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60W60/00, B60W40/00, B60W50/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G05D1/0212 (EP);
B60W60/0011 (EP,US);
B60W30/12 (EP,US);
B60W30/18145 (EP);
B60W30/18163 (EP);
B60W40/068 (US);
B60W40/105 (US);
B60W40/114 (US);
B60W60/0015 (US);
G05D1/0217 (EP);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2552/40 (EP,US);
B60W2552/53 (EP,US);
B60W2720/10 (EP);
B60W2720/12 (EP);
B60W2720/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLANUNG DER TRAJEKTORIE EINES FAHRZEUGS, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING TRAJECTORY OF VEHICLE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND DEVICE | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PLANIFICATION DE TRAJECTOIRE DE VÉHICULE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET DISPOSITIF | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | Translation filed | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |