EP4276352 - LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Inc. 374, Okakuencho Shimodachiuri-agaru Karasuma-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8011 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTOIE, Yoshiki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8011 / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21917581.7 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021JP42444 | Priority number, date | JP20210001373 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021001373 | [2023/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022149356 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276352 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21Y115/10, F21S2/00, G01N21/84 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G02B6/0091 (EP);
F21S2/00 (KR);
F21S10/005 (KR);
F21V19/003 (KR);
F21V7/04 (KR);
G01N21/84 (KR);
G01N21/8806 (EP);
G02B6/0043 (EP);
G02B6/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | LICHTBESTRAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/46] | English: | LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IRRADIATION DE LUMIÈRE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | Translation filed | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003142245 (KIM KYOUNG SUB [KR])[A] 1-5; | [Y]JP2005156695 (KANAGAWA KAGAKU GIJUTSU AKAD, et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract, paragraph [0032] *; | [X]KR20080081709 (HB ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0037]-[0046], fig. 1-3 *; | [A]KR200444788Y (CHOI, Byeong-Il) [A] 1-5; | [Y]JP2015129706 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006], [0068], fig. 3 *; | [Y]JP2017227534 (CCS INC) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0021]-[0046], fig. 1-6 * | by applicant | WO2007023894 |