Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4278817
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.08.2024 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
22.08.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
22.08.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
15.03.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
20.02.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
20.10.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
25.09.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
26.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|