EP4278817 - RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL PARAMETER PRIORITIZATION WITH NETWORK SLICE DIFFERENTIATION AND ACCESS IDENTITY DIFFERENTIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Peng San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
HE, Linhai San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GRIOT, Miguel San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
AGARWAL, Ravi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
XU, Huilin San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 21918362.1 | 14.01.2021 | [2023/47] | WO2021CN71765 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022151153 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278817 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/0833, H04W48/18 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSKANALPARAMETERPRIORISIERUNG MIT NETZWERKSCHICHTDIFFERENZIERUNG UND ZUGANGSIDENTITÄTSDIFFERENZIERUNG | [2023/47] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL PARAMETER PRIORITIZATION WITH NETWORK SLICE DIFFERENTIATION AND ACCESS IDENTITY DIFFERENTIATION | [2023/47] | French: | HIÉRARCHISATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE CANAL D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE AVEC DIFFÉRENCIATION DE TRANCHES DE RÉSEAU ET DIFFÉRENCIATION D'IDENTITÉ D'ACCÈS | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN106572516 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2018142200 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]CN111448841 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [A]CN111557119 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [A]CN111955031 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]US2020367145 (ZHANG JUN [CN], et al) |