EP4258805 - SIDELINK PARAMETER CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Yi Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Shichang Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21918469.4 | 14.01.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN71915 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022151261 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258805 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04W72/04, // H04W92/18 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/14 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | H04W76/28, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION VON SIDELINK-PARAMETERN UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2023/41] | English: | SIDELINK PARAMETER CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE PARAMÈTRE DE LIAISON LATÉRALE, ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2023 | Translation filed | 04.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2016366645 (SONG SEONGWOOK [KR], et al); | [XY]CN111800894 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD); | [E]WO2021119474 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US], et al); | [E]WO2021127866 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | US2022174781 [ ] (YANG XIAODONG [CN], et al); | International search | [A]US2017289940 (YANG YOONOH [KR], et al); | [A]WO2018064477 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [X]CN111670603 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [X]CN111699723 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [X]CN111800764 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD); | [X]CN111800893 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD); |