EP4258797 - INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Weijie Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
HE, Chuanfeng Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21918588.1 | 15.01.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN72240 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022151384 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258797 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04W74/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/41] | English: | INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2023 | Translation filed | 07.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2019216818 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,9-11,14,15 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 15 * * page 15, line 20 - line 30 * * page 17, line 14 - page 19, line 15 * [Y] 7,8; | [XAY]EP3742858 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [ 0060] - [0063] - [ 0065] - [0068] - [ 0081] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0094] - [ 0098] , [ 0106] - [0111] - [ 0119] , [ 0120] , [ 0127] * * paragraphs [0140] - [0144] - [ 0146] , [ 0148] - [0151] * [A] 5,6,13 [Y] 7,8; | [X]CN112040558 (CHINA ACADEMY INF & COMM TECH) [X] 1,4,5,9,12-15 * page 7 - page 8 * * table 1 *; | [XI] - ZTE CORPORATION, "Discussion on potential techniques for channels other than PUSCH and PUCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201017), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2007745, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2007745.zip R1-2007745 Discussion on potential techniques for channels other than PUSCH and PUCCH.docx, (20201017), XP051939885 [X] 1-5,9-15 * Section 2.2 Potential enhancements on Msg3 PUSCH repetition * [I] 6 | [X] - MODERATOR (ZTE CORPORATION), "Feature lead summary#2 on coverage enhancement for channels other than PUSCH and PUCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201119), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2009805, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2009805.zip R1-2009805 Feature lead summary#2 on coverage enhancement for channels other than PUSCH and PUCCH.docx, (20201119), XP051955961 [X] 1-3,9-11,14,15 * Proposal 17; page 45 * * page 47 * | International search | [X]CN110312319 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-115 * claims 1-26 *; | [X]CN112040558 (CHINA ACADEMY INF & COMM TECH) [X] 1-115 * claims 1-17, description paragraphs [0038]-[0152] *; | [X]WO2020244393 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-115 * description pages 27-28 *; | [A] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Consideration on RACH procedure", 3GPP Draft; R2-151297 Consideration on RACH procedure, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20150419), vol. RAN WG2, no. Bratislava, Slovakia; 20150420 - 20150424, XP050936246 [A] 1-115 * entire document * |