EP4241973 - BATTERY POLE PIECE FORMING DEVICE AND FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eve Energy Co., Ltd. No. 38, Huifeng 7th Road Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Liang Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Ruirui Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | 03 /
LI, Junhua Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Yuan Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Jianhua Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Jincheng Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21918740.8 | 03.02.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021CN74986 | Priority number, date | CN20211042215 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110042215 | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022151541 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241973 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B30B3/00, B30B9/28, B30B15/30, H01M4/04, H01M4/139, H01M10/0525 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
B30B3/04 (EP);
B30B3/00 (CN);
B05C19/008 (US);
B30B15/30 (CN);
B30B9/28 (EP,CN);
H01M10/0404 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M4/0409 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/139 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FORMUNG EINES BATTERIEPOLSTÜCKS UND FORMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/37] | English: | BATTERY POLE PIECE FORMING DEVICE AND FORMING METHOD | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE PIÈCE DE PÔLE DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2023 | Translation filed | 06.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2012120952 (PANASONIC CORP); | [XYI]US2016043382 (TANIHARA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2016052010 (HAMABE MASASHI [JP], et al); | [XYI]CN109390562 (CHILWEE POWER CO LTD) | International search | [A]CN2395875Y (TIANFENG PLASTIC MACHINERY PLA [CN]); | [A]KR20130074644 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [X]CN107571517 (ANHUI JIAMING NEW MAT TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN107574679 (ANHUI JIAMING NEW MAT TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN107584846 (ANHUI JIAMING NEW MAT TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108598372 (DONGGUAN TAFEL NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN111822663 (QINGDAO JIUHUAN XINYUE NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | CN20211042215 |