EP4285892 - DEPOT COMPOSITION WITH CONTROLLED INITIAL RELEASE, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tionlab Therapeutics 72, Dugye-ro Pogok-eup Cheoin-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17028 / KR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Duck Soo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16628 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Eun Joo Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18452 / KR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 21923375.6 | 14.10.2021 | [2023/49] | WO2021KR14179 | Priority number, date | KR20210013387 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210013387 | KR20210117287 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210117287 | [2023/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022163966 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285892 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61K38/26 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | DEPOTZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONTROLLIERTER INITIALFREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/49] | English: | DEPOT COMPOSITION WITH CONTROLLED INITIAL RELEASE, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DÉPÔT À LIBÉRATION INITIALE CONTRÔLÉE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | Translation filed | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20060093300 (LG LIFE SCIENCES LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * See abstract; paragraphs [0031], [0032] and [0164]; and claims 1, 6 and 7. *; | [Y]KR100963435B (KOREA INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-13 * See abstract; paragraphs [0041]-[0043]; and claims 1-2. *; | [A]WO2011080733 (MAPI PHARMA LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-13* See entire document. *; | [A]KR101307729B (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR101686986B (SK CHEMICALS CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-13 * See abstract; paragraphs [0064]-[0066]; and claim 1. * | by applicant | JP5681626B |