EP4239998 - P-DIRECTION ADJUSTING STRUCTURE AND DOME CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No. 555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Gang Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Le Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21924491.0 | 31.12.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021CN143569 | Priority number, date | CN202110168516 | 07.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110168516 | [2023/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022166498 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239998 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/51, H04N23/52, G08B13/196 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04N23/52 (EP);
H04N23/50 (CN);
H04N23/51 (EP,CN);
G08B13/1963 (EP);
Y02E40/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | P-RICHTUNGSANPASSUNGSSTRUKTUR UND DOMKAMERA | [2023/36] | English: | P-DIRECTION ADJUSTING STRUCTURE AND DOME CAMERA | [2023/36] | French: | STRUCTURE DE RÉGLAGE DE DIRECTION P ET CAMÉRA DÔME | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2023 | Translation filed | 01.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2006147194 (JONES THEODORE L [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 28] , [0 35] , [0 36] , [0 40] - [0042]; figures 1-8 * [A] 6-8,10-13 [I] 4,5; | [IA]CN101258739 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-5,9 * figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8,10-13; | [IA]WO2009136679 (C PRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045]; figure 3 * [A] 6-8,10-13; | [A]KR20130016672 (SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [IA]KR101252748B (HDPRO CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 1-7 * [A] 6-8,10-13; | [A]US2014348498 (AIBA DAIGO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2016085069 (OKAMURA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |