EP4310514 - DEVICE FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF POWER IN ELECTRICAL PROTECTION PANELS IN BUILDINGS, BY MEANS OF TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEMY ENERGY, S.L. Avda. Brasil nº 30 28020 Madrid / ES | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHEZ MIRALLES, Alvaro 28020 Madrid / ES | 02 /
BOAL MARTIN-LARRAURI, Jaime 28023 Madrid / ES | 03 /
MARTIN MARTINEZ, Francisco María 28015 Madrid / ES | 04 /
MARTIN LOPO, Miguel Manuel 28015 Madrid / ES | 05 /
VAZQUEZ BLANCO, Antonio 27500 Chantada / ES | 06 /
RODRIGUEZ - MORCILLO GARCIA, Carlos 28023 Madrid / ES | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | González-Mogena González, Inigo Patentes Y Marcas Bravo Murillo n°373, 3°A 28020 Madrid / ES | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 21925533.8 | 10.02.2021 | [2024/04] | WO2021ES70091 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171908 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ES | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310514 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/00, G01R22/06 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01R22/063 (EP);
G01R22/065 (US);
G01K13/00 (EP);
G01R19/2513 (US);
G01R22/04 (EP);
H05K1/181 (US);
G01R21/02 (EP);
G01R21/133 (EP);
H05K2201/10022 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSMESSUNG IN ELEKTRISCHEN SCHUTZPANEELEN IN GEBÄUDEN MITTELS TEMPERATURMESSUNG | [2024/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF POWER IN ELECTRICAL PROTECTION PANELS IN BUILDINGS, BY MEANS OF TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE PUISSANCE DANS DES PANNEAUX ÉLECTRIQUES DE PROTECTION D'ÉDIFICES PAR MESURE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2023 | Translation filed | 11.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 08.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.09.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2023 | 29.02.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2450426 (CAIGER-SMITH PATRICK [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * , Page 7, line 13- page 10, line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2010264906 (SHAMIR ADI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * Paragraphs [0022]-[0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]ES1185959U (VILCHES MILLAN JOSE LUIS [ES]) [Y] 1-5 * , the whole document *; | [Y]EP3419040 (ENEXO AB [SE]) [Y] 1-5 * , Paragraphs [0006]-[0011]; figures *; | [Y]EP3477309 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-5 * , Paragraphs [0039]-[0047]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2019361057 (NAKANO SHINYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , Paragraphs [0003]-[0005],[0007],[0008]; figure 1 *; | [A]CN111650418 (JIANGSU ELE ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , Retrieved from EPOQUE, DataBase EPODOC, abstract. *; | [Y]EP3719509 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-5* , Abstract * | by applicant | ES1185959U |